Case Information: 55298 | |||
Short Caption: | ASSOCIATED MECHANICAL, INC. VS. HAMILTON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A524440 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/25/2010 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01682 | |
01/21/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David L. Riddle & Associates. Check No. 14728. | ||
01/25/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 10-01964 | |
02/04/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-03204 | |
02/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | 10-03207 | |
02/08/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. | 10-03520 | |
02/26/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 24, 2010. | 10-05196 | |
07/06/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-17467 | |
07/14/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-18084 | |
10/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-25850 | |
10/05/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 10-25871 | |
10/06/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Joint Appendix. | 10-25875 | |
11/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extending Time for the Filing of the Respondent's Brief Pursuant to NRAP 26(B)(2). | 10-29084 | |
11/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: December 6, 2010. | 10-29090 | |
12/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 10-31554 | |
12/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for the Filing of Appellant's Reply Brief Pursuant to NRAP 26(B). | 10-33470 | |
12/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: January 19, 2011. | 10-33474 | |
01/18/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 11-01730 | |
03/01/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 11-06176 | |
04/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal With Prejudice. | 11-10875 | |
04/27/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | 11-12430 | |
04/27/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 15, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | 11-12443 | |
05/03/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties filed on April 12, 2011, the stipulation is approved, and "this appeal is hereby dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. | 11-13076 | |
05/06/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Vacating Oral Argument. On May 3, 2011, this appeal was dismissed pursuant to a stipulation of the parties. Accordingly, the oral argument scheduled for June 15, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. is hereby vacated. | 11-13436 |