judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIMAC CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS. PARK RUN ACQUISITION, LLC

Case Information: 55297
Short Caption:SIMAC CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS. PARK RUN ACQUISITION, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 54138
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A542389 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/26/2010 / Schofield, PaulSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/21/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-01678
01/21/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/25/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael D. Stevenson. Check No. 1003.
01/26/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield 10-02201
02/18/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 10-04406
02/18/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation but a settlement conference will not be scheduled in that a settlement was reached by the parties. 10-04438
02/25/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-05016
02/25/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 10-05017
02/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP-TH fn1[We waive the requirement for appellant to file a docketing statement.] 10-05170
02/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.