Case Information: 49601 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF J. MICHAEL SCHAEFER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Cherry, Gibbons | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/11/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Record of Reinstatement Proceedings, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearings, Vols. 1 through 5. | 07-12741 | |
06/13/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. | ||
06/13/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Cherry disqualified. | 07-12955 | |
07/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. State Bar of Nevada's Non-Opposition to John Michael Schaefer's Applcation for Extension of Time. | 07-15247 | |
07/23/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Opening Brief due: July 31, 2007. | 07-16109 | |
08/02/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 07-17019 | |
08/03/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-17163 | |
08/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Robert E. Glennen. | 07-17259 | |
09/05/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion upon Stipulation to Extend State Bar's time to file Answering Brief. | 07-19491 | |
09/17/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. and Approving Stipulation. State Bar of Nevada's answering brief due: 5 days. | 07-20487 | |
09/20/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-20763 | |
10/23/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 07-23364 | |
03/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order Granting Bar Petition. " . . . we approve the panel's recommendation and deny the petition for reinstatement." fn 5-[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Michael Cherry, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC-WM/JH/RP/MD/NS | 08-05536 | |
03/26/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Motion for Rehearing. | 08-07448 | |
05/22/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Michael Cherry, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12938 | |
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-13181 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |