Case Information: 49615 | |||
Short Caption: | ASDI, LLC VS. BELAUSTEGUI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lander Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CV0009661 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/19/2007 / Nork, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/13/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Peter J. Smith--check no. 1359. | ||
06/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-12931 | |
06/18/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. as it Relates to Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Parital Judgment. | 07-13255 | |
06/19/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William E. Nork. | 07-13368 | |
06/22/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-13735 | |
06/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellants. | 07-13764 | |
06/26/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13956 | |
06/26/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-13957 | |
07/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-14841 | |
07/09/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We deny respondent's motion to partially dismiss this appeal. | 07-14869 | |
09/04/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Richard G. Barrow in the place and stead of Peter J. Smith. | 07-19441 | |
09/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Suggestion of Death upon the Record (Respondent Sam Bida.) | 07-19589 | |
09/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 07-19590 | |
09/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel (Matthew G. Jacobs and Alex M. Medina.) | 07-19669 | |
09/07/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 07-19670 | |
09/07/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 24, 2007. | 07-19675 | |
09/10/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. of mailing of Suggestion of Death upon the Record. | 07-19928 | |
09/26/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-21232 | |
11/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 07-24821 | |
11/29/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents' Response to Appellants' Motion to Withdraw Appeal. | 07-25811 | |
12/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Procedural Order. | 07-26452 | |
02/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We grant appellant's motion and dimiss this appeal." California attorneys Matthew R.G. Jacobs and Alexander Miles Medina shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this appeal. The clerk shall add Mr. Jacobs and Mr. Medina to the docket. The clerk shall file the proposed reply that was submitted with the motion. fn2[We have considered the reply in our resolution of this matter.] We deny respondents' request for attorney fees and costs under NRAP 38. fn4[Counsel for repondents filed a "Suggestion of Death Upon the Record, " informing this court of the death of respondent Sam Bida. In light of the dismissal of this appeal, however, no further action will be taken on this matter.] SNP-JH/RP/MD. | 08-04556 | |
02/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. | 07-26454 | |
02/25/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |