Case Information: 49603 | |||
Short Caption: | LEDBETTER (JOHN) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C185185 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/12/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/12/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Introduction (Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.) | 07-12846 | |
07/05/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. | 07-14596 | |
07/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Relief. On June 27, 2007, this court received proper person documents labeled, "Complaint." To the extent that petitioner seeks relief in his proper person submissions, the relief is hereby denied. | 07-16542 | |
07/31/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-15567 | |
07/31/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |