Case Information: 49604 | |||
Short Caption: | URRIZAGA (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRMS884563 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/12/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-12848 | |
06/12/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/23/07. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. Filed in district court on: June 7, 2007. | 07-12849 | |
06/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Withdrawal of that Certain Contingent Supplemental Request of the State for Rough Draft Transcripts Pursuant to the Provisions of N.R.A.P. 3C9d0940, filed on the 11th of June, 2007; and Declaration in Support Thereof. | 07-13145 | |
06/15/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Contingent Supplemental Request of the State for Rough Draft Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 5/27/88 and 7/12/88. Court Reporter: Lange and Manley. Filed in district court on: June 11, 2007. | 07-13148 | |
06/18/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 23, 2007. Court Reporter: Tia Lange. | 07-13313 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 30, 2007. | 07-15863 | |
08/01/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16913 | |
08/01/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-16914 | |
08/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 12 pages. | 07-17678 | |
08/10/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17679 | |
08/10/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-17680 | |
10/12/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-22592 | |
11/06/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22716 | |
11/06/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 09, 2007. | 07-22716 |