Case Information: 49605 | |||
Short Caption: | DULIN-EVANS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45686 , 46695 , 46707 , 46817 , 48671 , 49183 , 49466 , 52231 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C210081 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/12/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-12859 | |
07/11/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/11/07. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. Not filed in district court. | 07-15100 | |
08/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-17096 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. | 07-17476 | |
09/10/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. | 07-19830 | |
09/10/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-19868 | |
09/10/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-19869 | |
09/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-19870 | |
09/17/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. as Moot. On September 10, 2007, appellant filed the fast track statement and appendix. Fast track response due: October 1, 2007. | 07-20486 | |
09/26/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae (ACLU of Nevada.) | 07-21288 | |
09/26/2007 | Brief | Received Amicus Brief. (American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada) | 07-21290 | |
09/26/2007 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Exhibits to Brief of Amicus Curiae (American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada). | 07-21292 | |
10/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. State's Opposition to the American Civil Liberties Union's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae or in the Alternative State's Motion fo Enlargement of Time. | 07-21762 | |
10/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Proposed Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union's Request for Leave to file Reply to State's Opposition to ACLU's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae. | 07-22396 | |
10/10/2007 | Motion | Received Reply to Response. Proposed Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union's Proposed Reply to State's Opposition to ACLU's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae. FILED PER ORDER OF 10/30/07. | 07-22397 | |
10/11/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Amended Certificate of Service for ALCU's Request for Leave to File Reply and the Proposed ACLU Reply. | 07-22521 | |
10/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief provisionally submitted on September 26, 2007. Fast Track Response due: 30 days and shall not exceed 20 pages in length. | 07-22847 | |
10/16/2007 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. | 07-21290 | |
10/16/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Exhibits to Brief of Amicus Curiae (American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada). | 07-21292 | |
10/30/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the reply to the State's opposition to the ACLU's motion to file an amicus brief provisionally submitted on October 10, 2007. | 07-23755 | |
10/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Proposed Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union's Proposed Reply to State's Opposition to ACLU's Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae. | 07-22397 | |
11/21/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-25496 | |
03/24/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn15[On October 9, 2007, this court received a proper person notice to the court. Appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this court in this matter in proper person and this court declines to consider such documents.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-07111 | |
04/18/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-08061 | |
04/18/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/28/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2008. | 08-08061 |