Case Information: 36301 | |||
Short Caption: | GRANITE CONSTRUCTION VS. SODERQUIST | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A378043 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/26/2000 / Christensen, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Wadhams & Akridge, P.C.--check no. 20139. | ||
06/19/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10400 | |
06/26/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
08/14/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Address for law firm of Wadhams & Akridge, P.C. | 00-14181 | |
11/15/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are discussing settlement. | 00-20047 | |
05/24/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are continuing negotiations towards settlement. | 01-08765 | |
06/08/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. (Granite Construction Company). | ||
10/24/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are continuing negotiations towards settlement. | 01-17923 | |
12/24/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 10, 2002. | 01-21646 | |
01/17/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 02-01245 | |
01/24/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-01660 | |
01/30/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 02-01944 | |
01/30/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |