judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STAMBERT LEE DEAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1169
Short Caption:STAMBERT LEE DEAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-6998-09Filed Date:09/15/2010

Opening Event Date:09/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStambert Lee Dean Y
Sicilia C. EnglertYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sicilia Englert, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
09/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sicilia Englert, Esquire
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/15/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (29 pgs/White) 6/21/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (111 pgs/White) 6/22/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (203 pgs/Price) 6/23/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (172 pgs/Price) 6/24/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (24 pgs/Price) 6/25/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (17 pgs/tape) 9/1/10 proc. w/cd
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
12/30/2010RECORD INDEX
12/30/2010RECORD COPIES
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (SEALED pleadings)
01/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (no oppo)
01/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. (Castillo)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011APPENDIX
05/05/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/06/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo & reply brief
05/11/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE for 30 days (unopposed)dwm
05/17/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE, IF ANY, to appellee's motion for summary affirmance shalfl be filed NO LATER THAN JUNE 24, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
06/24/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to motion for summary affirmance and aplt's reply brief.
10/07/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/07/2011FiledAffirmed
11/02/2011FiledMandate