Case Information: 49612 | |||
Short Caption: | ALLEN (GENE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41274 , 42969 , 43599 , 44180 , 44597 , 44991 , 45220 , 45368 , 45447 , 45643 , 46035 , 46666 , 47311 , 47501 , 48289 , 49167 , 50188 , 50477 , 50809 , 51219 , 51353 , 51675 , 51940 , 52984 , 53246 , 53428 , 53429 , 53732 , 53911 , 54132 , 54302 , 55013 , 55574 , 55677 , 55828 , 56586 , 57925 , 57990 , 58038 , 58426 , 58427 , 58807 , 59173 , 60890 , 61311 , 72586 , 72586-COA , 72853 , 72864 , 72929 , 72964 , 73526 , 77046 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177427 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/13/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12910 | |
08/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 07-17554 | |
09/12/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED" in 49167 and we DISMISS the appeal in Docket No. 49612. SNP08-JH/RP/MD. fn20[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in these matters.] Nos. 49167/49612. | 07-20075 | |
10/09/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-20379 | |
10/09/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/17/2007 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Original document entitled, "Motion for Rehearing." | ||
10/17/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2007. | 07-20379 |