Case Information: 49590 | |||
Short Caption: | DUESING VS. SHINEHOUSE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43162 , 43480 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A468506 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/26/2007 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/08/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hutchison & Steffen, Ltd.--check no. 11700. | ||
06/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-12591 | |
06/08/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Douglas sat in district court proceedings. | 07-12596 | |
06/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Premature Appeal. | 07-12913 | |
06/19/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | 07-13363 | |
06/26/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. | 07-13971 | |
07/02/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Appeal without Prejudice. | 07-14394 | |
07/02/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 07-14395 | |
07/12/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. on Settlement Judge Roitman for Notice of Withdrawal. | 07-15160 | |
12/21/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We grant that motion and dismiss this appeal." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-27744 | |
12/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |