Case Information: 49607 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIJALVA (JULIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C222533 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/12/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-12870 | |
06/20/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/16/07. Court Reporter: Beverly Signurik. Not filed in district court. | 07-13492 | |
08/07/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days. | 07-17353 | |
08/15/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-17975 | |
08/15/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-17976 | |
09/07/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-19727 | |
12/13/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. | 07-27056 | |
01/14/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea filed in district court on January 8, 2008. | 08-00915 | |
03/06/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-05681 | |
04/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-07645 | |
04/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2008. | 08-07645 |