Case Information: 49606 | |||
Short Caption: | DOWNS (JIMMY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36503 , 39757 , 50121 , 50704 , 53290 , 58877 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150891 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/12/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12863 | |
07/24/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-16174 | |
07/31/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion to Reinstate Appeal. | 07-16819 | |
08/24/2007 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-18772 | |
09/18/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-19065 | |
09/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/25/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2007. | 07-19065 |