Case Information: 49599 | |||
Short Caption: | DNGR EXPRESS GROUP VS. CBS TRANSPORTATION | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A483652 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/19/2007 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-12709 | |
06/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-12713 | |
06/19/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | 07-13356 | |
06/28/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Cortese Law Firm-check no. 1568. | ||
07/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-14836 | |
07/12/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15157 | |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Docketing Statement. Due: 10 days. | 07-17973 | |
09/17/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-20436 | |
09/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 07-20437 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). | 07-26690 | |
12/10/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |