Case Information: 49610 | |||
Short Caption: | D.R. HORTON, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (COURT AT ALIANTE HOMEOWNERS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51399 , 52751 , 55799 , 57888 , 64145 , 64493 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A527641 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/13/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 085856. | ||
06/13/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 07-12897 | |
06/13/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Jack C. Juan, Esq. | 07-12898 | |
06/13/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appendix of Law Cited in D.R. Horton Inc.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. | 07-12899 | |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Volume 1. | 07-12900 | |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Volume 2 | 07-12901 | |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Volume 3 | 07-12903 | |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Petitioner's Appendix, Volume 4. | 07-12904 | |
06/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition or Mirror Writ in the First Light Case. | 07-12905 | |
06/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Filed additional copy of appendix. Vol. 1. | 07-12900 | |
06/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Filed additional copy of appendix. Vol 2. | 07-12901 | |
06/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Filed additional copy of appendix. Vol. 3. | 07-12903 | |
06/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Filed additional copy of appendix. Vol 4. | 07-12904 | |
06/19/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. We temporarily stay the proceedings in A527641 pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to the stay motion. | 07-13323 | |
06/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Plaintiff's Opposition to D.R. Horton's Emergency Motion for stay Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition or Mirror Writ in the First Light Case. | 07-13450 | |
07/20/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Mandamus and Prohibition. | 07-15919 | |
07/20/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Court at Aliant's Appendix Vol. 1 | 07-15921 | |
07/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Stay. We vacate the temporary stay of the proceedings in District Court Case No. A527641, imposed by our June 19 order. | 07-16392 | |
07/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to file Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. | 07-16553 | |
08/08/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to D.R. Horton's Motion for Leave to file Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. | 07-17429 | |
09/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Leave to File a Reply. Due: 30 days. | 07-20027 | |
10/10/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. D.R. Horton's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. | 07-22354 | |
10/10/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Reply Appendix, Vol. V. | 07-22360 | |
10/10/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Reply Appendix, Vol. VI. | 07-22361 | |
10/18/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Petition. (Real Party in Interest) | 07-23017 | |
10/29/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. D.R. Horton's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition and Countermotion for Court to Issue Writ of Mandamus in Accordance with D.R. Horton v. Dist. Ct., 123 Nev. Adv. Op. No. 45 (2007). | 07-23638 | |
01/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "We grant the petition, in part, and we direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its order denying petitioner's motion to dismiss and to reconsider this issue in light of D.R. Horton." Fn9 [In light of this order, petitioner's alternative request for a writ of prohibition is denied. We deny real party in interest's motion to dismiss this petition based on mootness and judicial estoppel.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-00367 | |
01/07/2008 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order and mailed to Jack Juan for service upon Judge Susan Johnson. | 08-00421 | |
01/14/2008 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Johnson on January 10, 2008. | 08-00421 | |
02/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-01413 | |
02/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |