Case Information: 49591 | |||
Short Caption: | WILSON (TENECA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45682 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207003 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/05/2007 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-12598 | |
06/15/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 06/01/06 and 10/19/06. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: 06/12/07. | 07-13142 | |
06/15/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 04/03/07. Court Reporter: Francesca Haak. Filed in district court on: 06/12/07. | 07-13143 | |
06/26/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 16 Page Fast Track Statement. | 07-13948 | |
07/02/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 6/1/06, 10/19/06 and 4/3/07. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 07-14388 | |
07/05/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on June 26, 2007. | 07-14664 | |
07/05/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-13949 | |
07/05/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-13950 | |
07/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 33 Page Fast Track Response. | 07-16067 | |
07/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response provisionally submitted on July 23, 2007. | 07-16254 | |
07/25/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-16070 | |
07/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to State's Motion for Leave to File 33 Page Fast Track Response, or in the Alternative, Motion to Permit Ms. Wilson to File a Fast Track Reply or that Full Briefing be Ordered. | 07-16576 | |
08/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to File a Fast Track Reply to the State's Fast Track Response and Motion for Full Briefing. | 07-17055 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. Opening Brief due: 60 days. Fn1 [ . . .In light of our order directing full briefing in this appeal, we deny appellant's motion to reconsider the filing of the fast track response as moot.] | 07-17477 | |
08/15/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change in Status of Counsel for Appellant. (Effective 8/27/07 JoNell Thomas joins the office of Special Public Defender and will retain her appointment as attorney of record for appellant.) | 07-18037 | |
08/23/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-18715 | |
09/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 34 pages. | 07-21039 | |
09/24/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-21040 | |
10/05/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 07-22035 | |
10/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request to Expedite Decision on Appeal. | 08-08496 | |
04/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to the extent that this court's docket will allow expedited review of the appeal. | 08-09018 | |
01/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-JH/RP/MD. | 09-01508 | |
02/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-02102 | |
02/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2009. | 09-02102 |