Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 10-01820 |
01/22/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
01/25/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | | 10-01971 |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Richard McKnight, P.C. - check no. 2148. | | |
01/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Richard McKnight. | | 10-02310 |
02/04/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel And Request To Correct Service Lists. | | 10-03183 |
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-04079 |
02/19/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 10-04571 |
02/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. (Cross-Appeal) Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
02/24/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sterling Law. Check No. 1111. (Respondents/Cross-Appellants) | | |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant/cross-respondent: Thomas Tanksley. | | 10-05322 |
03/02/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 2/19/10 addressed to Sterling Law. Per USPS, "return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward". Address updated per phone call to firm. Rec for Docs remailed. | | 10-05432 |
03/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. of counsel for appellant/cross-respondent to withdraw. The clerk shall remove Richard McKnight from the docket of this appeal. Appellant: 30 days to retain new counsel. The timelines for filing of the Early Case Assessment Report and Final Settlement Program Status Report are stayed. | | 10-05625 |
03/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Thomas J. Tanksley filed a notice of appearance representing appellant/cross-respondent. The settlement judge shall continue with settlement proceedings. ECAR due: 30 days; Final Status Report due: 180 days | | 10-05645 |
03/04/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Supplemental Proof of Service Re: Notice of Appearance of Counsel [In Appeal Proceedings]. | | 10-05735 |
03/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 10-07560 |
04/07/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant | | 10-08927 |
04/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) | | 10-08928 |
04/07/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) | | 10-08954 |
04/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The premediation conference is continued for 10 days to afford counsel additional time to confer with clients. | | 10-09168 |
06/02/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/30/10 | | 10-14162 |
09/07/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 10-22767 |
09/10/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 15 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. | | 10-23222 |
09/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion by Appellant and By Its Counsel for Temporary Stay of Proceedings, Including Extension of Time to Comply with NRAP 9(a), Pending Potential Motion by Counsel to Withdraw; or, Alternatively, Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellant. | | 10-24549 |
10/14/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Receipt of Notice of Bankruptcy Filing. | | 10-26868 |
11/01/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Counsel for Appellant Thomas Tanksley. | | 10-28587 |
11/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. We deny the motion for a temporary stay and grant the motion to withdraw as counsel. Notice of Appearance for appellant/cross-respondent due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. | | 10-29612 |
11/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Supplement to Pending Motions with Request to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff/Appellant. | | 10-29794 |
12/09/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of New Appearance of Counsel Thomas J. Tanksley, Ltd. for Plaintiff/Appellant and Cross-Resondent Fremont Bruce, LLC. | | 10-32195 |
12/14/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Supplement to Notice of New Appearance of Counsel for Plaintiff/Appellant and Cross-Respondent. | | 10-32566 |
12/14/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appellant's Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings and of Deposit of Appellant's Portion with Court Recorder. | | 10-32694 |
12/16/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice-Supplement to: Notice of Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings and of Payment Deposits. | | 10-32894 |
12/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Transcript Form due: 15 days. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondents' combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, respondents shall have 30 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. | | 10-32983 |
01/04/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 28, 29, 30 and May 1, 4, 6, 7, 11, 12, 13. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen and Julie Potter. Filed on District Court on 12/14/2010. | | 11-00376 |
01/11/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-01022 |
01/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Request by Plaintiff/Appellant and Cross-Respondent for Order of a Briefing Schedule for Appeal and Cross-Appeal. | | 11-01168 |
01/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion. Withdrawal of Request by Plaintiff/Appellant for Briefing Schedule in Light of Prior Order of Dec. 17, 2010 Providing Briefing Schedule (of which Counsel Had Not Been Aware). | | 11-01561 |
01/18/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-01590 |
02/17/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation - Joint And Stipulated Request for up to ThirtyDay Extension to File Opening Brief And Appendix so that Both Sides My Attempt to Formulate a Joint Appendix to Extent Feasible. | | 11-05138 |
02/17/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 18, 2011. | | 11-05165 |
04/15/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 11-11322 |
04/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Volumes 1-4. | | 11-11325 |
04/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion by Appellant Fremont Bruce, LLC to Permit Supplemental Submission of Attached Electronic Version of Exhibit. (DETACHED EXHIBIT LLL FROM MOTION AND FILED PER ORDER 06/21/2011). | | 11-11795 |
04/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. | | 11-12148 |
05/17/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to file Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 11-14509 |
05/17/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due date: June 16, 2011. | | 11-14531 |
06/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request). Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-17786 |
06/21/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Supplement the Appendix. The clerk of this court shall detach from the motion and file exhibit LLL as a supplement to the appendix. | | 11-18493 |
06/21/2011 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit LLL. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON 04/20/2011 AND FILED PER ORDER 06/21/2011). | | 11-18499 |
07/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief due: July 18, 2011. | | 11-19815 |
07/19/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (Third Request) Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-21663 |
07/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion by Appellant Pursuant to NRAP 31(d) Due to Respondent's Failure to Timely File Briefs in this Court While Apparently Working on Comprehensive Filings in the Bankruptcy Proceedings. | | 11-22790 |
08/02/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fourth) Respondent-Cross-Appellant. | | 11-23207 |
08/05/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Respondents' Belated Fourth Extension Request and Appellants' Renewed Request under NRAP 31(d). | | 11-23623 |
08/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Rusk's Reply in Support of Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 11-23920 |
08/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Rusk's Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. | | 11-23923 |
08/17/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Vols 1 thru 3 with CD-ROM included. | | 11-25058 |
08/29/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix - Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Appendix Volume 4 with CD. | | 11-26233 |
09/02/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Resolving Motions. Respondents/cross-appellants' motions for extensions of time are denied as moot. Respondents/cross-appellants' answering brief due: 11 days. We defer ruling on appellant/cross-respondent's July 28, 2011, motion for confession of error and to dismiss the cross-appeal. | | 11-26886 |
09/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Answering Brief/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 11-27855 |
09/14/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion Approved to File Excess Pages in Answering Brief/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 11-27860 |
09/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 11-27861 |
10/06/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Conversion of Fremont Bruce, LLC Bankruptcy Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. | | 11-30482 |
10/11/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 11-31262 |
11/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). | | 11-34344 |
11/08/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Staying Appeal and Directing Status Report. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Status Report due: 20 days. Any Reply due: 11 days from service of the status report. fn1[We defer ruling on appellant/cross-respondent's July 28, 2011, motion for confession of error and to dismiss the cross-appeal.] | | 11-34391 |
11/17/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report Status Report per Order of Nevada Supreme Court, Dated Nov. 9, 2011; Response to Respondent/Cross-Appellants? Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal and Appellants? Counter | | 11-35559 |
11/30/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Court Order (Re: Order Directing Status Report Filed November 8, 2011). | | 11-36674 |
02/14/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal and Cross-Appeal. This appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed without prejudice. Fn2[All pending motions and requests for relief are denied as moot]. | | 12-04847 |
03/12/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-07838 |
03/12/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
03/21/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 16, 2012. | | 12-07838 |
09/16/2013 | Motion | Filed Notice Regarding Waivers of Right to Reinstate Appeal. | | 13-27311 |