Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders--check no. 73326. | | |
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. (Kerry Malin, PA-C) Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 07-12633 |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mandelbaum & Schwarz, Ltd.--check no. 4007. | | |
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. (Appellants David Wikler, D.O., and Wikler Family Practice Associates) Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 07-12687 |
06/19/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 07-13355 |
06/26/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. David Wikler & Wikler Family Practice Associates. | | 07-13906 |
06/26/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd., check no. 34810. | | |
06/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 07-13978 |
06/26/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired. | | 07-13985 |
06/26/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Ara H. Shirinian. | | |
06/27/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Malin). | | 07-14036 |
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 07-14134 |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Ara H. Shirinian. | | |
07/12/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | | 07-15158 |
07/18/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 07-15691 |
07/24/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 07-16224 |
07/24/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. | | 07-16226 |
07/27/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. on Settlement Judge. | | 07-16536 |
08/30/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 07-19218 |
09/12/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondent: 15 days to request transcripts; Appellant: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | | 07-20104 |
09/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Cross-Appeal of Plaintiffs pursuant to NRAP 42 and to Identify Underlyuing Defendants Kerry Malin, PA-C. David Walter, D.O., and Wikler Family Practice Associates, as Appellants pursuant to NRPA 28(h). | | 07-20500 |
09/25/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Malin. Transcripts requested: 02/20/07 and 10/09/06. To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | | 07-21113 |
09/28/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondents/Cross-Appellants David Wikler & Wikler Family Practice Associates. Transcripts requested: 08/15/06 to 08/25/06 (08/16/06, 08/17/06 (2), 08/22/06 (2), 08/23/06, 08/24/06). To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | | 07-21522 |
10/02/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondents/Cross-Appellants David Wikler & Wikler Family Practice Associates Amended Request. | | 07-21710 |
10/25/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (Second Amended) Transcripts requested: 8/16/06, 8/17/06, 8/18/06 (2), 8/24/06, 10/9/06 and 2/20/07. To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | | 07-23489 |
11/01/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal of Michelle Amador. The clerk shall modify the caption to reflect this dismissal and to identify Wikler as appellants, and Amador as respondent in this appeal. Amador shall be listed as respondent in the caption as follows: "Michelle Amador, as guardian ad litem of Alexandria Amador, Kimberly Amador, Rita Painter, and Nicole Amador." Wikler shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. | | 07-24031 |
12/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 10, 2008. | | 07-26627 |
12/10/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Leta Haupt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/16/06, 8/17/06, 8/18/06 (2), 8/24/06, 10/9/06 and 2/20/07. | | 07-26795 |
01/07/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/16/06, 8/17/06, 8/18/06 (2), 8/24/06 (4), 10/9/06, and 2/20/07. Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | | 07-28403 |
01/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellants David Wikler & Wikler Family Practice Associates. | | 08-00681 |
01/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Appellants David Wikler & Wikler Family Practice Associates. | | 08-00682 |
01/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (Appellant Malin) | | 08-00924 |
01/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transcripts. Court reporters Leta Haupt and Kim Tuchman are no longer required to file these transcripts in this court. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] fn2[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | | 08-01561 |
01/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. To Joint Appendix. | | 08-01918 |
02/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-03125 |
03/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant Malin. | | 08-06086 |
03/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant Kerry Malin, PA-C. | | 08-06498 |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal of Judgment on Behalf of Michelle Amador as Guardian Ad Litem of Alexandra Amador, Only. | | 08-18737 |
07/22/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Partially Dismissing Appeal. This appeal is dismissed as to respondent Michelle Amador only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees related to that portion of the the appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption to reflect this dismissal. | | 08-18897 |
10/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | | 08-27921 |
10/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
04/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Counsel Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders for Appellant Malin. | | 09-09995 |
04/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record. | | 09-10155 |
04/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | | 09-10759 |
05/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to withdraw as moot. | | 09-10940 |
05/26/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 09-12195 |
05/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2009. | | 09-12195 |