Case Information: 49594 | |||
Short Caption: | CHAMBERLAIN-VOLGGER VS. VOLGGER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D346612 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/08/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Caruso Law Offices--check no. 10613. | ||
06/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-12620 | |
06/27/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14066 | |
07/06/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Marvin L. Longabaugh, Esq. | 07-14821 | |
07/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Premature Notice of Appeal. | 07-14822 | |
07/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 07-14835 | |
07/16/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Premature Notice of Appeal. | 07-15367 | |
09/07/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-19755 | |
10/02/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-19820 | |
10/02/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/12/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2007. | 07-19820 |