Case Information: 49584 | |||
Short Caption: | KYRIACOU (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34039 , 44678 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C134979 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/20/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/06/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/06/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12425 | |
06/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-13229 | |
08/20/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 10. | 07-18346 | |
08/20/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/17/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and Directing Correction of the Judgment of Conviction." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-06566 | |
04/11/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-07962 | |
04/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2008. | 08-07962 |