Case Information: 49585 | |||
Short Caption: | TABILE (BRANDON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55628 , 61500 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202973 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/21/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/07/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-12477 | |
06/07/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 07-12478 | |
06/15/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 07-13175 | |
06/25/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13859 | |
07/06/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 07-14837 | |
07/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Deadline to Request Transcripts. | 07-16583 | |
07/27/2007 | Transcript Request | Received Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/5/07, 2/13/07, 2/14/07, 2/15/07, 2/16/07 and 5/15/07. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. | 07-16587 | |
07/30/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Deadline to Request Transcripts. | 07-16712 | |
08/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the transcript request form received on July 27, 2007. | 07-18797 | |
08/24/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter Sonia Riley. | 07-16587 | |
09/12/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sonia L. Riley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-20131 | |
09/14/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/05/07, 02/13/07, 02/14/07, 02/15/07, 02/16/07, and 05/05/07. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley-Bennett. | 07-20313 | |
09/21/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Joel M. Mann, Esq. | 07-20879 | |
10/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-22401 | |
10/31/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We accept the district court's appointment of Mr. Mann as appellant's counsel for this appeal. The clerk shall remove Ms. Rasmussen and the law firm of Watt, Tieder, Hoffar & Fitzgerald, as counsel for appellant. We grant the 10/10/07 motion to the following extent. Appellant: the opening brief and appendix shall be filed by 1/8/08. Fn1 [A copy of the district court minute entry is attached to this order.] | 07-23873 | |
11/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transcripts. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcripts listed in Ms. Riley's notice. Appellant shall include copies of the requested transcripts in the appendix to the opening brief and Ms. Riley is not obligated to file copies of the transcripts in this court. Fn1 [Appellant shall include a copy of each requested transcript in the appendix to the opening brief and shall serve copies of the opening brief and appendix upon respondent. Accordingly, no action concerning appellant's amended transcript request form will be taken at this time.] | 07-25334 | |
01/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-00717 | |
01/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 08-00720 | |
02/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-03384 | |
03/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-05930 | |
03/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-06959 | |
03/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/03/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-30687 | |
12/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-31195 | |
12/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 6, 2009. | 08-31195 |