judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILBOURN (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31697
Short Caption:MILBOURN (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32771
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C70901Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/11/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
02/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. Nos. 31502, 31511, 31624, 31625, 31689, 31690, 31691, 31696, 31697.
06/11/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 3 (copies).
06/11/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received proper person Motion for Immediate Submission of Appeal (Received the original and 2 copies--1 returned to Appellant). (nos. 32771 & 31697).
07/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-12928
08/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13039
08/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/17/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 10, 2001. 01-13039