judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN T. WARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1168
Short Caption:ALLEN T. WARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-10508-09Filed Date:09/14/2010

Opening Event Date:09/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAllen T. Ward Y
Erek L. BarronNN
Chieko Maria ClarkeNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1168 and 10-CF-1175 are consolidated for all purposes herien. F/O that Eric Barron, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Allen T. Ward in appeal no. 10-CF-1168. F/O that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Larry Hill in appeal no. 10-CF-1175. F/O that cousen for appellant Larry Hill shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been orderd and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. F/O that counsel for appellant Allen T. Ward shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 90 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Eric Barron, Esquire in appeal 10-CF-1168
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CF-1168) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CF-1175) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (35 pgs/tape) 5/13/09 proc. w/cd
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (42 pgs/tape) 10/27/09 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (205 pgs/Graybill) 3/1/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (96 pgs/Rogers) 3/2/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (5 pgs/tape) 6/1/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (278 pgs/Pirfo) 6/2-3/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (55 pgs/Van Bremen) 6/4/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (10 pgs/tape) 8/20/10 proc. a.m.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (22 pgs/tape) 8/20/10 proc. a.m.
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1168)
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1168)
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (SEALED PSR dtd 5/11/09)
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-1175)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1175)
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31.(Castillo)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (WARD)
01/21/2011APPENDIX (WARD)
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 25, 2011 (no oppo) (HILL)
01/28/2011 On consideration of appellant Larry Hill's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant Larry Hill's motion is granted and appellant Larry Hill's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (HILL) to July 25, 2011 no oppo
04/28/2011 On consideration of appellant Larry Hill's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant Larry Hill's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (Hill)
08/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Larry Hills motion for extension to 10/24/11.
09/02/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (95 pgs/Pirfo) 6/2/10 proc. w/cd
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Hill) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Hill's motion for extension of time to file brief and limited appendix to 1/10/12.
01/05/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver (Hill) (Appellant)Granted
01/20/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver (Hill) (Appellant) in appeal no. 10-cf-1175 and these appeals are severed, brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
02/09/2012LodgedMotion To Remand (Appellant)
02/14/2012FiledMotion To Remand (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledOrder Granting Appellant's motion to remand
02/23/2012FiledRemanded
02/23/2012FiledMandate