judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. LELA B. MARTIN v. MRS. FRANK J. MARTIN

Case: A-2788
A-2788
07/03/1950
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. LELA B. MARTIN
MRS. FRANK J. MARTIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/15/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/13/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
11/07/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1950Response to Brief filed
11/13/1950Response to Reply filed
11/07/1950Reply to Response
09/26/1950Response to Petition
07/03/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Frank J. MartinRespondent
Mrs. Lela B. MartinPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information