Case Information: 55306 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (SHAWN) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49588 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070791 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-01815 | |
01/22/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-03016 | |
02/03/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 10-03017 | |
02/19/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-04490 | |
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-18258 | |
08/10/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19126 | |
08/10/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/02/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2010. | 10-19126 |