Case Information: 49597 | |||
Short Caption: | PARKS VS. ENDEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46532 , 48214 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0511018 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-12665 | |
06/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Extension of Time Order. | 07-13350 | |
10/02/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Appointment of Counsel and Granting Motion for Extension of Time to file Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Due: 30 days. Fn2[To the extent that appellant requests any further relief in the "declaration" attached to this motion, his request is denied.] | 07-21757 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-26672 | |
12/31/2007 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Reconsideration Order. | 07-28346 | |
01/30/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 08-02423 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13926 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. | 08-13926 |