Case Information: 49596 | |||
Short Caption: | PERINI BLDG. CO. VS. DIST. CT. (NEVADA RESORT PROPERTIES) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A497450 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Martin & Allison, Ltd.--check no. 10214. | ||
06/11/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 07-12658 | |
06/11/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 1 of 2. | 07-12659 | |
06/11/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 2 of 2. | 07-12660 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 07-15888 | |
08/23/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 07-18725 | |
01/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus compelling the district court to vacate its order denying petitioner's motion for prejudgment writs of attachment and garnishment and to reconsider that motion in light of this order." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 08-00356 | |
01/07/2008 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Noah G. Allison for service upon Judge Mark R. Denton. | 08-00424 | |
02/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-01411 | |
02/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |