Case Information: 55292 | |||
Short Caption: | BLACK EAGLE CONSULTING VS. DIST. CT. (LA FRIEDA) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52638 , 58390 , 61477 , 62284 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800971 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Prohibition | 10-01665 | |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $250 from Roger S. Doyle | ||
01/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioners' Appendix to Petition for Writ of Prohibition | 10-01666 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03281 | |
02/11/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing Writ of Prohibition. | 10-03787 | |
02/11/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03807 | |
02/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Fahrendorf, Viloria, Oliphant & Oster, LLP - check no. 16597. | ||
04/09/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-09251 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-09981 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |