Case Information: 55288 | |||
Short Caption: | SORIA VS. CHRISTIANA BANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52901 , 54279 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A567333 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/20/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-01650 | |
01/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-01651 | |
02/12/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs and Pilot Program packet 1/20/10 addressed to Alex Soria. Per stamp on envelope, "Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". No forwarding address. | 10-03927 | |
02/17/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christopher R. Paloma, Sonia Rodis. Check No. 1038. | ||
03/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order/Judgment entered on 1/26/10. Due Date: 10 days | 10-07401 | |
03/19/2010 | Other | Other. Reissued Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement and Transcript Request Form. Due date: 40 days. | ||
03/31/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order Granting Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Renewed Motion to Expunge Notice of Lis Pendens. Filed in district court on 1/26/10. | 10-08391 | |
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal, and "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-15067 | |
07/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16868 | |
07/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 15, 2010. | 10-16868 |