Case Information: 55287 | |||
Short Caption: | HAYNES VS. PARBALL CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A568587 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/22/2010 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-01641 | |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-01642 | |
01/22/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 10-01817 | |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Murphy & Murphy Law Offices check no. 3290. | ||
02/18/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-04405 | |
02/22/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/2/10 | 10-04700 | |
05/24/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-13453 | |
05/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 10-13776 | |
06/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice. | 10-16843 | |
06/30/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). Fn1[In light of this order, we waive the requirement for appellant to file a docketing statement] CLK- SNP-TH | 10-17095 | |
06/30/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |