Case Information: 55302 | |||
Short Caption: | HADDAD (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55260 , 55652 , 55822 , 56325 , 56504 , 57575 , 57992 , 58302 , 61281 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C250496 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/21/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Defendants Emergency Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus Requesting Immediate Relief from District Court Clark County, Nevada. | 10-01724 | |
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-02954 | |
02/22/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 2/3/10 addressed to Richard S. Haddad. Per NDOC, Mr. Haddad is now at HDSP. Order remailed to new address. | 10-04671 | |
04/08/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-09091 | |
05/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-10129 | |
05/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |