Case Information: 55304 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32207 , 32253 , 39426 , 44072 , 44215 , 47252 , 49862 , 50074 , 57849 , 61691 , 62871 , 64268 , 73691 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108502 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/27/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01794 | |
01/21/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Order Denying Motion to Amend JOC - 2/5/10) | 10-04037 | |
02/24/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Amend Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on 2/5/10. | 10-04960 | |
03/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-06889 | |
05/27/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 49. | 10-13763 | |
05/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-18186 | |
09/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-23286 | |
10/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25768 | |
10/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2010. | 10-25768 |