Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | | 10-01671 |
01/21/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/16/09. | | 10-03161 |
02/10/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/09/08. | | 10-03733 |
03/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues Within Page Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure, or In the Alternative, Motion for Continuance Due to Missing Transcript. | | 10-05396 |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion for Full Briefing and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Court Reporter Joe D'Amato's Certificate of Delivery due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days. | | 10-06600 |
03/25/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joe D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/28/08. (Transcript attached) | | 10-07894 |
03/25/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. From Court Reporter J. D'Amato in response to Order filed 3/12/10. | | 10-07896 |
05/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Continuance to File FTS. | | 10-12398 |
05/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 25, 2010. | | 10-13287 |
06/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion For an Extension to File Fast Track Statement | | 10-16689 |
06/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw Due to Conflict of Interest and Request to Have the Case Remanded to District Court for Appointment of New Counsel. | | 10-16792 |
07/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Remanding for Counsel. The Clark County Public Defender's Office has moved to withdraw in this appeal, informing this court that the Office just became aware of an actual conflict of interest. Respondent has not opposed the motion. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1[Because we suspend the briefing of this appeal, we deny the motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement as moot.] | | 10-18601 |
08/25/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Minute Order Appointing Counsel Ms. Kice as counsel for appellant. (Response to 7/20/10 Order - Caprodriguez) | | 10-21773 |
09/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall add Stephanie Kice as counsel for appellant. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. | | 10-22408 |
10/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time - Fast Track Statement. | | 10-26322 |
10/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 12, 2010. | | 10-26632 |
11/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Caprodriguez's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Complexity of Issues and Request for Full Briefing. | | 10-29641 |
11/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Denying Motion for Full Briefing. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | | 10-30309 |
12/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Caprodriguez's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Counsel's Illness. | | 10-32533 |
12/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Re-submittal of Motion for Extension of Time with Medical Records Attached. | | 10-32736 |
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 27, 2011. | | 10-33078 |
01/27/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time - Fast Track Statement. | | 11-02734 |
02/04/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for extension of time. Appellant: 10 days to file the fast track statement and appendix due 10 days. | | 11-03573 |
02/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion - Appellant Caprodriguez's Request For Full Briefing. | | 11-03982 |
02/07/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 02/18/2011). | | |
02/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion For Request Of Extension Of Time To File The Appellant's Appendix. | | 11-03984 |
02/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Second Motion for Request of Extension of Time to File the Appellant's Appendix. | | 11-04810 |
02/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Full Briefing, Denying Motion for Extension of Time, and Striking Fast Track Statement. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. We deny the motion for an extension to file the fast track appendix. The clerk of this court shall strike the fast track statement filed on February 7, 2011. | | 11-05314 |
03/22/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 11-08691 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. | | 11-08767 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. | | 11-08772 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. | | 11-08773 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. | | 11-08774 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. | | 11-08775 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. | | 11-08776 |
03/22/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. | | 11-08777 |
04/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Supplement Opening Brief. | | 11-10877 |
04/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Amended Opening Brief due: 10 days. | | 11-11089 |
04/25/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. | | 11-12157 |
05/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time First Request to file the Answering Brief. (30) days. | | 11-15482 |
05/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: June 24, 2011. | | 11-15485 |
06/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File 32 Page Answering Brief. | | 11-18966 |
06/24/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion to file excess pages in Answering Brief is Approved. | | 11-18968 |
06/24/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-18969 |
08/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. | | |
02/10/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | | 12-04510 |
02/10/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
07/31/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP12C-MC/KP/JH | | 12-24111 |
08/27/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-27008 |
08/27/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
09/11/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2012. | | 12-27008 |