Case Information: 55294 | |||
Short Caption: | LOWE (JARVIS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49906 , 54464 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C223479 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/07/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01669 | |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04879 | |
05/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. | 10-11963 | |
05/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/18/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 5/7/10 addressed to Jarvis Lowe. Per NDOC, Mr. Lowe has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 10-12938 | |
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-14958 | |
06/24/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 6/10/10 addressed to Jarvis Lowe. Per NDOC, Mr. Lowe has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 10-16461 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16189 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-16189 | |
07/22/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 7/8/10 addressed to Jarvis Lowe. Per NDOC, Mr. Lowe has been "discharged". No forwarding address. | 10-18890 |