Case Information: 55289 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMIREZ (MIGUEL) VS. BAKER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 09EW000341B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/18/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/20/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01656 | |
01/20/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04875 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-05313 | |
05/18/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-12856 | |
05/18/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement, a Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form, and the Instructions for Civil Litigants Without Attorneys. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 40 days. | 10-18389 | |
08/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-19907 | |
08/18/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-21254 | |
09/28/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-24973 | |
10/25/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-27760 | |
10/25/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
11/05/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2010. | 10-27760 |