Case Information: 49598 | |||
Short Caption: | ALL PERU, INC. VS. SUNRISE CITY PLAZA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A527305 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/19/2007 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 085831. | ||
06/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-12677 | |
06/19/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | 07-13341 | |
06/29/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14289 | |
06/29/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-14290 | |
06/29/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Attorney Kevin Hansen returning respondent's docketing statement unfiled. | ||
07/12/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-15145 | |
07/13/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 07-15271 | |
07/19/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15729 | |
08/29/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-19127 | |
09/13/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 07-20245 | |
12/12/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-27029 | |
01/09/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00314 | |
01/09/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/16/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 14, 2008. | 08-00314 |