Case Information: 49588 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (SHAWN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55306 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070791 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/07/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-12484 | |
06/13/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/30/07 and 5/8/07. Court Reporters: C. Brown & C. Esienberg. Filed in district court on: June 11, 2007. | 07-12920 | |
06/26/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 05/08/07. Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. | 07-13941 | |
07/17/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-15516 | |
07/17/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-15517 | |
08/07/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17299 | |
09/25/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-21090 | |
10/23/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22161 | |
10/23/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2007. | 07-22161 |