Case Information: 51431 | |||
Short Caption: | KUBLAWI (MOUNIR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50639 , 55346 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221912 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/21/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09278 | |
04/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order entered 3/21/08 and Decision and Order entered 3/26/08. Due Date: 10 days | 08-10107 | |
04/30/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Notice of Entry Decision and Order entered 3/26/08 and Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order entered 3/21/08. | 08-10787 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Redesignating Appeal. We elect to construe this appeal as an appeal from the order denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ habeas corpus. We conclude that this appeal is not subject to the provisions of NRAP3C. The clerk of this court shall remove the Clark County Public Defender from the docket as counsel of record, and this appeal shall hereafter proceed as a proper person appeal. | 08-13928 | |
06/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 90 days. | 08-16103 | |
07/21/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-18800 | |
07/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conlude that appellant is only entitiled to the relief described herein.] | 09-18039 | |
08/18/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-18451 | |
08/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2009. | 09-18451 |