Case Information: 53412 | |||
Short Caption: | ARRINGTON (ROOSEVELT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C243870 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/12/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-06428 | |
03/12/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-06429 | |
03/17/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. Requesting that this court orders his attorney to forward all transcripts and court minutes to him.FILED PER ORDER OF 3/30/09. | 09-06679 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. filed on March 17, 2009 and March 26, 2009. The clerk of this court shall file the motions. Appellant shall proceed through his counsel of record. | 09-07897 | |
03/30/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Requesting that this court orders his attorney to forward all transcripts and court minutes to him. | 09-06679 | |
03/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. For extension of time. | 09-07625 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500 due: 15 days, or Rough Draft Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. | 09-09145 | |
04/15/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/28/08, 12/18/08, 12/30/08, 2/24/09. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: 3/20/09. | 09-09472 | |
04/29/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 09-10593 | |
05/13/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-11874 | |
05/13/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-11875 | |
06/02/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 09-13674 | |
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-03014 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04366 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04366 |