judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANCASTER (DOYLE) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 51446
Short Caption:LANCASTER (DOYLE) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47082 , 49844 , 62314 , 69707 , 69707-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030255Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/22/2009How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/15/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-09392
04/15/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-09393
05/15/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. 08-12215
06/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Imposing Sanctions. This matter warrants the conditional imposition of sanctions. Appellant: 15 days to pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated if appellant's counsel files and serves the docketing statement and transcript request form or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within 10 days from the date of this order. 08-15591
07/18/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Docketing Statement and Motion to Waive Sanctions. 08-18533
07/18/2008Transcript RequestReceived Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: All. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. FILED PER ORDER OF 8/27/08. 08-18537
08/08/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time within which to File Request for Rough Draft Transcript. 08-20598
08/25/2008MotionFiled Motion. Attorney Paul Quade. 08-21875
08/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Notwithstanding their untimeliness, and cause appearing, Mr. Quade's motions for extensions of time to file the docketing statement and transcript request form are granted. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on July 8, 2008, and the transcript request form received on July 18, 2008. Mr. Quade is admonished for his failure to comply with this court's procedural rules and order. Mr. Quade's motion to waive sanctions is granted to the following extent. The sanction imposed in this court's June 18, 2008, order is hereby vacated. 08-22109
08/27/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-17352
08/27/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). No dates provided. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. Filed in district court on: June 17, 2008. 08-18537
09/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. Quade: 7 days to file proof of service of the motion to withdraw on appellant. 08-23503
09/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record served on appellant. 08-24604
10/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Paul E. Quade as counsel for appellant. Appeal remanded. District Court Order due: 35 days. Briefing suspended. 08-26411
11/20/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed copy of order electronically filed in district court on 11/17/08 appointing Scott Edwards as counsel for appellant. 08-29769
11/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days 08-29772
11/24/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/14/08. (In response to Order filed 10/14/08.) 08-30004
12/17/2008Transcript RequestReceived Certificate of No Transcript Request. FILED PER ORDER OF 1/6/09. 08-31998
12/31/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. and Certificate Regarding Transcription. 08-33098
01/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on December 31, 2008, and the certificate received on December 17, 2008. 09-00183
01/06/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-31998
01/06/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-33096
03/27/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. 09-07817
04/13/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-09251
04/13/2009AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 09-09252
05/13/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Order for Transmission of Confidential Documents 09-11929
05/13/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-11931
05/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Transmission of Confidential Documents. District Court Documents due: 15 days. (Sealed Presentence Investigation Report and Psychosexual Report). 09-12847
06/01/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. (in response to Order 5/22/09) 09-13584
06/22/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
10/26/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-26047
11/20/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-28252
11/20/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/02/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 23, 2009. 09-28252