Case Information: 51460 | |||
Short Caption: | REEVES (BRANDI) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C236361 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/18/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-09740 | |
04/18/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-09743 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days. Briefing suspended. | 08-10846 | |
05/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Defendant, Brandi Lea Reeeves' Response to Order to Show Cause and Notice of Non-Opposition to Dismissal of Appeal filed in Error. | 08-11770 | |
06/20/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-15812 | |
07/15/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-17903 | |
07/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2008. | 08-17903 |