Case Information: 51459 | |||
Short Caption: | MENEFEE VS. FOUR QUEENS, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A539926 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/22/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kolias Law Offices check no. 3907. 5/19/08: CHECK RETURNED FOR INSUFFICIENT FUNDS | ||
04/18/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09732 | |
04/21/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. (Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger) | ||
04/22/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 08-10016 | |
05/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11129 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Carolyn Worrell. (Docketing Statement) | 08-11288 | |
05/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-12519 | |
05/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Issued letter to Marina E. Kolias re: check returned for insufficient funds and requesting payment of filing fee within 10 days." | 08-12582 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge Status Report states that Counsel reports the appeal will be withdrawn and stip to dismiss will be filed shortly. | 08-13466 | |
06/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 08-13807 | |
06/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kolias Law Offices - check no. 1053. | ||
07/21/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-18680 | |
07/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |