judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MURAD VS. WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC.

Case Information: 51450
Short Caption:MURAD VS. WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A508287Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/18/2008 / Hammer, BillSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/16/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Leslie Mark Stovall check no. 25485.
04/16/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-09504
04/16/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-09505
04/17/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. (Law Firm of Kravitz, Schnitzer, Slaone, Johnson & Eberhardy, Chtd.)
04/18/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Bill C. Hammer. 08-09772
05/07/2008Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/23/08. 08-11427
05/16/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-12355
05/16/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Appellant's First Request to Englarge Time to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. 08-12356
05/23/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on May 7, 2008, and the response to docketing statement received on May 20, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-13074
05/23/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-11427
05/23/2008Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 08-12652
05/27/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Appellant's First Request to Englarge Time to File Docketing Statement. 08-13216
06/26/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference was conducted on May 27, 2008. A subsequent conference will be set in late July, 2008. 08-16387
09/15/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-23756
11/18/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant Counsel Stovall. 08-29339
11/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Motion to Withdraw, Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Order to Show Cause. We defer ruling on the motion to withdraw until the instant order to show cause is resolved. Briefing remains suspended. Appellant's response due: 15 days. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. 08-29915
12/11/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Reply to Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Order to Show Cause and Motion to Enlarge Time to Provide Supplemental Reply. 08-31565
12/29/2008MotionFiled Reply to Response. Respondent Weingarten Nostat, Inc.'s Reply to Appellant's Reply to Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw, Concluding Settlement Proceedings in Order to Show Cause and Motion to Enlarge Time to Provide Supplemental Reply. 08-32840
01/22/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. and Granting Motion to Withdraw. "This appeal is dismissed." The clerk shall remove Leslie Mark Stovall, Michael L. Mascarello, Jared B. Anderson and the Law Offices of Leslie Mark Stovall as counsel of record for appellant on this court's docket. Fn4 [Appellant's request for an extension of time to file a supplemental response is denied as moot.] NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-01856
02/17/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-02221
02/17/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2009. 09-02221