judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAGEN VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 32182
Short Caption:HAGEN VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C65501Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/26/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings, in each of the above-identified appeals. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32139, 32140, 32141, 32182, 32190, 32219, 32220, 32227.
08/26/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1through 4 (copies).
08/26/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-15727
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15785
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2000. 00-15785