judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES STAFFORD, d/b/a EVERGREEN TREE CARE v. JHL, INC., d/b/a JACKSON HOLE LANDSCAPING

Case Heading (S-07-0285)
Case Number:S-07-0285Case Docketed On:12/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JAMES STAFFORD, d/b/a EVERGREEN TREE CARE v. JHL, INC., d/b/a JACKSON HOLE LANDSCAPING
Full Title:JAMES STAFFORD, d/b/a EVERGREEN TREE CARE, Appellant (Defendant), v. JHL, INC., d/b/a JACKSON HOLE LANDSCAPING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames StaffordJohn H. Robinson
Timothy W. Miller
AppelleeJHL. INC., d/b/a JACKSON HOLE LANDSCAPINGGlenn W. Myers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 128
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/10/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/15/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/15/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance from Timothy W. Miller on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/13/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata to appellant's briefNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
04/24/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
04/29/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/12/2008Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Mr. Miller's office regarding reply brief. She discovered her copy was missing the table of contents, table of authorities, and the first page. She faxed the missing pages and they were inserted into our original and copies.EventPhone CallFinal
05/13/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/05/2008Order - Assignment of judge, John Fenn to act in this matter and recusing Justice VoigtOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, DJ Fenn writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/13/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal