judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES (KELSEY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51435
Short Caption:JAMES (KELSEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C235292Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/15/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 08-09307
04/15/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 08-09311
05/01/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Fast track briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. 08-10853
05/21/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 08-12728
07/11/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-17701
08/05/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-19735
08/05/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/12/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 7, 2008. 08-19735