judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRANFORD (DUKE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51451
Short Caption:CRANFORD (DUKE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44238 , 53847 , 54553 , 54556 , 55010
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C036017Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/25/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/16/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/16/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-09520
04/25/2008Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Docs 4/16/08. Address updated per Notice of Appeal filed 4/16/08. Remailed to corrected address. 08-10429
04/30/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 08-10710
04/30/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed in District Court on 4/28/08. Due Date: 10 days 08-10712
05/08/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk in response to the notice issued on April 30, 2008. 08-11523
05/15/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12258
07/25/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 14. 08-19286
07/25/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/28/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 22, 2008. (Order denying petition for writ of mandamus) 08-19442
02/11/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 09-03754
03/10/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-05598
03/10/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/19/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 13, 2009. 09-05598