Case Information: 51445 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVIS (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53174 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR7003 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09389 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/24/08. Order for Court Appointment and Evidentiary Hearing. (This document was inadvertantly entered in Docket No. 51445 and has since been transferred to the proper case of Docket No. 51505.) | 08-10423 | |
05/20/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12645 | |
05/27/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In light of the dismissal of this appeal, this court denies this motion. | 08-13264 | |
06/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. On May 20, 2008, this court dismissed this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. On May 27, 2008, this court received a proper person motion for extension of time to file a fast track statement and appendix. No good cause appearing, this court denies the motion. | 08-14327 | |
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13170 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2008. | 08-13170 |