Case Information: 51444 | |||
Short Caption: | PATACSIL (RUFINO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56626 , 60018 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI070561 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/15/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09388 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record. Due: 90 day. | 08-10831 | |
05/06/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-11274 | |
05/06/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record due: 30 days. | 08-17217 | |
07/14/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-18004 | |
07/14/2008 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
09/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal (Transcript of 9/6/05). Due: 40 days. | 08-23583 | |
09/11/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Appellant: Response due 10/8/08. | 08-23587 | |
09/15/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-23798 | |
09/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/06/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn13 [This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter. We deny appellant's request for counsel in this appeal.] NNP08C-MC/WM/NS. | 08-28389 | |
12/02/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-28929 | |
12/02/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 2008. | 08-28929 |