judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAYROLL SOLUTION I, INC. VS. MUELLER

Case Information: 53406
Short Caption:PAYROLL SOLUTION I, INC. VS. MUELLERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 53010
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A524191Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/20/2009 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/12/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/12/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-06371
03/12/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-06372
03/18/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. 09-06883
03/18/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days (Corrected notice.) 09-06884
03/19/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis and Roca LLP - check no. 405813.
03/20/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld 09-07066
04/06/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-08648
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. 09-08650
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 09-08664
04/10/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on all parties including Settlement Judge. 09-09045
05/04/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. 53010 and 53406. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 6/26/09 09-10958
07/23/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 09-18021
07/31/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following tentative date: 9/25/09. The settlement judge requests an extension of 60 days. 09-18821
08/18/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. 53010 and 53406: Settlement Judge's request for extension of time approved. Final Status Report due: 60 days 09-20108
10/05/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. 53010 and 53406. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-24270
10/13/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Fn1[Upon completion of briefing, this apeal may be consolidated with related appeal in Docket No. 53010. Parties may file a stipulation or motion to consolidate] 09-25007
11/06/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Consolidate Appeals and to Modify Briefing Sequence. Nos. 53010/53406. 09-27246
05/06/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals.Payroll Solutions I's unopposed motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket No. 53010 with the appeal in Docket No. 53406 is granted. Payroll Slutions I shall have 15 dyas from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form in Docket No. 53406. The Mueller appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve their opening brief and appendix addressing the issues raised in the appeal in Docket No. 53010. Payroll Solution I shall have 45 days from the date when the opening brief is served to file and serve a combined answering brief for Docket No. 53010 and opeing brief addressing the attorney fees and cost issues presented in Docket No. 53406.The Mueller appellants then shall have 30 days from the date when Payroll Solutions I's combuned brief is served to file and serve any reply brief fro Docket No. 53010 combined with an answering brief addressing Docket No. 53406. Thereafter, Payroll Solutions I shall have 30 days to file and serve any reply brief addresing Docket No. 53406.
07/09/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Transcript Request Form from appellants in docket no. 53406 due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant in 53406.) Nos. 53010/53406 (10-17727).
07/30/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 24, 2010. Nos. 53010/53406.
08/18/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Sanctions. The $500 sanctions imposed by our July 9 order remainds in effect. Abran E. Vigil: 10 days to file a transcript request or certificate of no transcript request and proof of payment of sanction. Nos. 53010/53406 (10-21277).
08/25/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time (Second) Request to File the Opening Brief (53010). (20) days. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-21738
08/27/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent Payroll Solutions: Martha J. Ashcraft. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-22142
08/27/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Respondent, Payroll Solutions). Nos. 53010/53406. 10-22144
08/27/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction $500 to Supreme Court Library from Attorney Abran E. Vigil. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-22145
09/01/2010MotionFiled Response to Order Filed August 18, 2010 and Request to be Relieved of Further Duties in these Cases. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-22494
09/07/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 13, 2010. fn1[We defer ruling on the September 1, 2010, document related to the status of appellant's representation in Docket No. 53406.] Nos. 53010/53406. 10-22770
09/13/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-23580
09/14/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. 10-23710
10/14/2010MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Nos. 53010/53406. 10-26929
10/15/2010MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension of Time (answering brief). Nos. 53010/53406. 10-26961
10/18/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Stipulation for Extension of Time. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-27072
10/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Briefs. Respondent US Express Leasing's Answering Brief due: November 17, 2010. Respondent Payroll Solutions, Inc.'s combined Answering Brief in Docket No. 53010 and Opening Brief in Docket No. 53406 due: November 17, 2010. Appellant's Appendix in Docket No. 53010 due: 10 days. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-27497
11/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. Nos. 53010/53406. 10-28728
11/16/2010MotionFiled Respondent/Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Payroll Solution's Opening Brief. Nos. 53010/56406. 10-29988
12/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief in Docket No. 53010 and Opening Brief in Docket No. 53406 due: December 17, 2010. 10-32890
12/16/2010MotionFiled Respondent/Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Payroll Solution's Opening Brief (Third Request). 10-32931
12/16/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service . Amended Certificate of Mailing - Respondent/Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief and Payroll Solution's Opening Brief (Third Request). 10-32940
01/03/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief with CD-ROM included. Nos. 53010/53406. 11-00179
01/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent Payroll Solutions, Inc. (docket no. 53010) Answering Brief due: January 19, 2011. The clerk of this court shall file respondent US Express Leasing's answering brief received on December 30, 2010. Appellant in docket no. 53406 Opening Brief due: January 19, 2011. 11-00839
01/07/2011BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief of Tygris Vendor Finance, Inc., fka US Express Leasing, Inc. 11-00843
02/02/2011MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. 11-03388
02/02/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice-Motion Approved. Reply Brief due: February 14, 2011. 11-03395
02/10/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 53406 and Regarding Briefing in Docket No. 53010. "We dismiss PSI's appeal in Docket No. 53406 as abandoned." Fn2 [. . . Martha Ashcraft has not file a motion to withdraw, and she thus remains the attorney of record in these appeals.] 11-04452
03/07/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-06935
03/07/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 15, 2011. 11-06935